Trustees ALEX'S WISH
Charity Number: 1148845

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aishah Khatun Iqbal | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arthur William Grey Hazlerigg | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandesh Jesrani | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Alexandra Slack | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Wright | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ralph Everard | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JAYNE HALLAM | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ROGER HALLAM | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.