KIDDERMINSTER STREET PASTORS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteers, who are drawn from Christian churches of different denominations provide a listening ear and practical help to the vulnerable in our community. We typically patrol the streets at night and work in partnership with the police, local councils and a range of organisations. The gospel of Jesus Christ is the reason for what we do but is not at the forefront of what we say.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 30 July 2012: Standard registration
- 29 August 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 29 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1168930 BEWDLEY STREET PASTORS
- KSP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.34k | £963 | £2.04k | £2.14k | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £120 | £639 | £1.80k | £1.32k | £950 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN KIDDERMINSTER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFILL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY. 2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN KIDDERMINSTER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 3) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LICENCE AGREEMENT EXECUTED WITH ASCENSION TRUST AND THE CORE VALUES AND MISSION STATEMENT APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN KIDDERMINSTER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF CARING, LISTENING AND HELPING PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND AT VARIOUS VENUES DAY AND NIGHT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window