TUDOR HOUSE BROADWAY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a community museum and education facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 14 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara White | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Anna Locker | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Simon James Marson | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Shane Neal | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN MUNRO | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Malcolm Austin Rogers | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
JOHN HARVEY PAINTER BA, FCA | Trustee | 06 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.56k | £88.67k | £102.51k | £77.07k | £85.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.72k | £89.59k | £85.34k | £131.56k | £100.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £47.97k | £20.48k | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM AND/OR ART GALLERY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broadway Museum & Art Gallery
Tudor House
65 High Street
BROADWAY
Worcestershire
WR12 7DP
- Phone:
- 01386859047
- Email:
- admin@broadwaymuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window