BETHESDA HEALING AND REVIVAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the year we have run our third Christian prayer ministry training school facilitated by Elijah House Ministries. This provided a safe setting for the attendees to learn and practice prayer ministry and the opportunity to experience personal healing through small group ministry. This school was held in Nottingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE MARY SCOTT | Chair | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Gary Stuart MACE | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Susan Winship | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE HELEN JONES | Trustee | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER HAROLD SCOTT | Trustee | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.03k | £9.02k | £12.56k | £11.71k | £23.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.69k | £1.47k | £4.84k | £6.68k | £9.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/09/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF APPEARING IN SCHEDULE 1 IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROMOTION OF PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH, WHOLENESS AND WELLBEING THROUGH: I.THE PROVISION OF PRAYER FOR HEALING. II.THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES. III.THE DISTRIBUTION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE AND RESOURCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 LANSDOWNE ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG6 0DL
- Phone:
- 01159701066
- Email:
- bethesdahrc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window