BLACKTOFT BEACON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training Young People to become good citizens, by teaching life skills using the Scout Method. Providing camping facilities for Scouts; Guides; external organisations and local people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 July 2012: Standard registration
- NONE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SCOTT MILLARD | Chair | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Claire Margaret Norman | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jonathan Wales | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Robert Morablanco | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carlton Cooper | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Daniel | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Colin Andrew Shand Fitch | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Jane Fraser | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rory Kershaw | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN WILSON | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA WENDY MACADAM | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|||||
RACHAEL MACADAM | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Linda Thelwell | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|||||
JOY MILESTONE | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS JO COOK | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT JOBLING | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.63k | £3.13k | £13.77k | £30.92k | £37.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.89k | £5.90k | £14.43k | £23.60k | £34.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £359 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 East Mount
NORTH FERRIBY
HU14 3BX
- Phone:
- 01430423241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window