RIGHTS AND ACCOUNTABILITY IN DEVELOPMENT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAID PROMOTES RESPONSIBLE CONDUCT AND RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS BY COMPANIES AROUND THE WORLD BY: MONITORING HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES, WORKING WITH VICTIMS TO SEEK JUSTICE AND REDRESS; RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY TO RAISE AWARENESS; INFORMING AND ADVISING GOVERNMENTS, UN, OECD AND OTHER BODIES AND ADVOCATING BINDING CORPORATE ACCOUNTABILITY FRAMEWORKS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£680,245
Donations and legacies | £680.25k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£556,396
Raising funds | £33.16k | |
Charitable activities | £523.24k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £33.16k | |
Charitable expenditure | £523.24k | |
Retained for future use | £123.85k |
People

6 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Mozambique
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 15 February 2013: Standard registration
- RAID (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Crawshaw | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Muleya Mwananyanda | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathryn Nwajiaku-Dahou | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Boardman | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
David White | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £296.59k | £370.86k | £278.17k | £306.49k | £680.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £322.24k | £322.58k | £302.74k | £338.33k | £556.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £680.25k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £523.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £248.28k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/09/2003 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS), AND ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT AND COMPLIANCE WITH THE LAW BY CORPORATIONS, THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: - MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; - RAISING AWARENESS ON HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; - RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; - INFORM AND ADVISE GOVERNMENTS, INTERNATIONAL AND NATIONAL ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES ON MATTERS CONCERNING BUSINESS AND HUMAN RIGHTS; - EDUCATING THE PUBLIC AND CORPORATIONS ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; - INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY ON HUMAN RIGHTS; - PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS (NGOS) AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; - COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; - CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; - PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG THE PUBLIC AND CORPORATIONS; - PROMOTING PUBLIC AND CORPORATE SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; - RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES; - OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES; AND - SEEKING TO REDUCE AND ELIMINATE INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO: - ENGAGE IN CAMPAIGNING AND EDUCATION TARGETED AT INTERNATIONAL CORPORATIONS; AND - ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY TARGETED AT INTERNATIONAL CORPORATIONS, PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Studio 204
ScreenWorks
22 Highbury Grove
London
- Phone:
- 02036970269
- Email:
- raid@raid-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window