Financial history 1066 GYMNASTICS

Charity number: 1148794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £249.82k £196.42k £216.89k £271.50k £268.00k
Total expenditure £279.75k £197.91k £226.57k £240.00k £259.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £46.96k £95.82k £2.27k N/A £1.00k