WAVENEY STARDUST TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The association was established for the relief of disabled people by the provision of facilities for recreation in particular by the provision of boat trips in the Suffolk and Norfolk Broads primarily in the Waveney Valley area with the object of improving the condition of life of such persons
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 19 July 2012: Standard registration
- 21 July 2014: Funds received from 802146 WAVENEY STARDUST
- WAVENEY STARDUST TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ginnette Ann Lovegrove | Chair | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Alan Stone | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anthony Foreman | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ADRIAN COWIE | Trustee | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.72k | £12.75k | £6.14k | £19.10k | £36.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.67k | £39.97k | £37.97k | £41.56k | £47.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 26 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JUN 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION; IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF BOAT TRIPS IN THE SUFFOLK AND NORFOLK BROADS PRIMARILY IN THE WAVENEY VALLEY AREA, WITH THE OBJECT IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hippersons Boatyard
Gillingham Dam
Beccles
NR34 0EB
- Phone:
- 07460750625
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window