SEAGROVE PAVILION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A new pavilion incorporating changing facilities has been built for use by local sports clubs and the wider community. It is used by local community groups including Girl Guides, Senior Citizen Clubs, the Parish Council etc. It is also used for ,one off' events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 20 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Strickland | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Hadfield | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
VILMA BARRACLOUGH | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patric Robert Maude | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grainne Andrews | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Heather | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Burghard | Trustee | 22 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Macklin | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.67k | £12.28k | £12.00k | £8.66k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.05k | £12.33k | £9.50k | £6.40k | £9.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF LOCAL COMMUNITY OF THE PARISH OF NETTLESTONE AND SEAVIEW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND TO PROMOTE AMATEUR SPORT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES THAT WILL ASSIST WITH COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN SPORTS THAT PROVIDE HEALTHY RECREATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Caws Avenue
SEAVIEW
Isle Of Wight
PO34 5JS
- Phone:
- 0796617551
- Email:
- SEAGROVEPAVILION@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window