Accounts and annual returns SHOWERS OF MERCY MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1148759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 06 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 28 July 2024 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 28 July 2024 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 June 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 May 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required