Accounts and annual returns PENTECOSTAL REVIVAL ASSEMBLIES OF GOD

Charity number: 1148540
Charity reporting is up to date (124 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 February 2024 25 April 2025 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2024 25 April 2025 124 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 22 February 2023 11 February 2024 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2023 11 February 2024 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 22 February 2022 07 February 2023 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2022 07 February 2023 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 22 February 2021 21 March 2022 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2021 21 March 2022 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 22 February 2020 18 February 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 February 2020 18 February 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window