Financial history PENTECOSTAL REVIVAL ASSEMBLIES OF GOD

Charity number: 1148540
Charity reporting is up to date (124 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/02/2020 22/02/2021 22/02/2022 22/02/2023 22/02/2024
Total gross income £234.41k £142.16k £231.40k £201.67k £209.97k
Total expenditure £160.82k £141.70k £179.50k £175.76k £161.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A