WARRINGTON ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH (MIND)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of advice and guidance to people suffering from mental health problems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warrington
Governance
- 14 February 1974: Standard registration
- 15 July 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WARRINGTON M I N D (Working name)
- WARRINGTON AND DISTRICT ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.42k | £71.39k | £67.15k | £68.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.29k | £68.31k | £73.38k | £75.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 01 February 2008 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 19 February 2008 | 19 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 28 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 28 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 16 February 2005 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 16 February 2005 | 16 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 20 JUNE 1973 AS AMENDED 25 JANUARY 1983 AND 18TH JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT, IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF MIND.
Area of benefit
WARRINGTON DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window