Growth Path Services

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We exist to support young people to break free of the cycle of poverty by becoming more independently capable of supporting themselves. We support NEET young people to achieve work experience, qualifications and employability skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 16 November 2012: Standard registration
- Growth Path Services (Working name)
- KRT (Working name)
- KINGSTANDING REGENERATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Peach | Chair | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maisie Haddock-Garey | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Peniket | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Jones | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Othman Usman | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Singh | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Cook | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Byrne | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.74k | £486.89k | £189.34k | £244.63k | £457.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.64k | £417.38k | £267.90k | £260.66k | £309.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £89.06k | £55.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.44k | £17.96k | £1.81k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/11/2012 as amended on 17 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS:- 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 3.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3.1.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP:(I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 3.1.5 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE,BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.1.6 THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; 3.1.7 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.1.8 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 3.1.9 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 3.1.10 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; 3.1.11 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; AND 3.1.12 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; AND 3.2 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Growth Path Services
Brookvale Park
Erdington
BIRMINGHAM
B23 7AG
- Phone:
- 01214396780
- Email:
- Anya@growthpath.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window