Financial history SHROPSHIRE CRICKET BOARD LIMITED

Charity number: 1148878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £363.98k £296.28k £381.66k £524.91k £603.70k
Total expenditure £359.56k £286.23k £372.79k £513.05k £593.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £4.70k £13.17k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £95.58k £157.36k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £428.28k £442.97k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £56 £2.36k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £1.00k £1.00k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £461.75k £535.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £3.60k £2.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £51.31k £58.07k