LOVE MUSIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Love Music Trust (LMT) is committed to providing access to high quality music education and exposure to outstanding musical experiences to all pupils in Cheshire East. The LMT is owned, led and managed by schools, and supported by carefully chosen key partners within the local community. LMT offers music education services to all primary, secondary and special schools within Cheshire East.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£982,811
Donations and legacies | £504.33k | |
Charitable activities | £470.03k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.10k | |
Other | £7.35k |
Total expenditure:
£957,115
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £957.12k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £488,426 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £957.12k | |
Retained for future use | £25.70k |
People

7 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 16 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mark Humphreys | Chair | 26 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Mark Parkinson | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Dickson | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Gardiner | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Hill | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE COWELL | Trustee | 11 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN PETER JOHNSON SAVAGE | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH IRENE BURNS | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £931.68k | £810.77k | £807.89k | £926.52k | £982.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £918.78k | £778.09k | £810.52k | £902.14k | £957.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £479.12k | £483.67k | £489.58k | £489.31k | £488.43k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £481.15k | £484.58k | £8.74k | £506.00k | £504.33k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £443.74k | £324.94k | £796.48k | £419.26k | £470.03k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £352 | £384 | £50 | £92 | £1.10k | |
|
Income - Other | £6.44k | £864 | £2.63k | £1.17k | £7.35k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £918.78k | £778.09k | £810.52k | £901.97k | £957.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.72k | £3.74k | £3.74k | £2.43k | £2.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £84.13k | £76.92k | £75.72k | £84.06k | £89.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £171 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £113.30k | £104.96k | £98.38k | £108.21k | £96.50k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £302.80k | £320.31k | £322.35k | £340.99k | £378.12k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £117.06k | £93.55k | £91.64k | £95.73k | £95.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/06/2012 as amended on 04 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO ADVANCING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION AND THE ARTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY: (1)SEEKING TO ENSURE THAT EVERY CHILD IN THE REGION AGED FIVE TO EIGHTEEN HAS THE OPPORTUNITY TO LEARN A MUSICAL INSTRUMENT (OTHER THAN VOICE) THROUGH WHOLE-CLASS ENSEMBLE TEACHING PROGRAMMES FOR IDEALLY A YEAR (BUT FOR A MINIMUM OF A TERM) OF WEEKLY TUITION ON THE SAME INSTRUMENT; (2)PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO PLAY IN ENSEMBLES AND TO PERFORM FROM AN EARLY AGE; (3)ENSURING THAT CLEAR PROGRESSION ROUTES ARE AVAILABLE AND AFFORDABLE TO ALL YOUNG PEOPLE; (4)DEVELOPING A SINGING STRATEGY TO ENSURE THAT EVERY PUPIL IS SINGING REGULARLY AND THAT CHOIRS AND OTHER VOCAL ENSEMBLES ARE AVAILABLE IN THE AREA; (5)OFFERING CONTINUOUS PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT TO SCHOOL STAFF, PARTICULARLY IN SUPPORTING SCHOOLS TO DELIVER MUSIC IN THE CURRICULUM; (6)PROVIDING AN INSTRUMENT LOAN SERVICE, WITH DISCOUNTS OR FREE PROVISION FOR THOSE ON LOW INCOMES; (7)PROVIDING ACCESS TO LARGE SCALE AND/OR HIGH QUALITY MUSIC EXPERIENCES FOR PUPILS, WORKING WITH PROFESSIONAL MUSICIANS AND/OR VENUES; (8)DELIVERING MUSIC EDUCATION WHICH WILL GIVE SCOPE FOR ALL PUPILS TO PROGRESS AND REACH THE NEXT LEVEL OF EXCELLENCE; (9)PROVIDING JOINED UP HIGH QUALITY MUSIC SERVICES (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, MUSIC TUITION, EVENTS, TRIPS AND ENSEMBLES) TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BOTH IN AND OUT OF SCHOOL; (10)ENSURING THAT CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE HAVE THE OPPORTUNITY TO EXPERIENCE THE RICHNESS OF THE ARTS; (11)PROMOTING EFFECTIVE COLLABORATION BETWEEN THE CHARITY AND THE WIDER LOCAL CULTURAL OFFERING; (12)COLLABORATING WITH SCHOOLS, OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND THE WIDER LOCAL COMMUNITY BOTH IN TERMS OF DELIVERING MUSIC SERVICES TO YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADVOCATING THE IMPORTANCE OF MUSIC EDUCATION TO SCHOOL LEADERS; (13)ENSURING THAT A DIVERSE RANGE OF MUSICAL EXPERIENCES WILL BE AVAILABLE THAT WILL RESPOND TO LOCAL NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 2A BRADWALL COURT
BRADWALL ROAD
SANDBACH
CHESHIRE
CW11 1GE
- Phone:
- 01270766214
- Email:
- dosborne@sandbachschool.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window