Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST SCHOOL

Charity number: 1149558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 14 September 2024 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 02 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 02 April 2023 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 July 2021 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 28 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required