Financial history STUDENT UNION LETTINGS LIMITED

Charity number: 1149922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.72m £1.91m £1.46m £1.49m £1.74m
Total expenditure £1.55m £1.71m £1.33m £1.31m £1.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.00k N/A £1.78k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.70m £1.90m £1.45m £1.44m £1.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £3.42k £3.04k £15.53k £43.65k
Income - Other £22.48k £11.03k £10.18k £25.45k £13.36k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.55m £1.71m £1.33m £1.31m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.10k £6.60k £6.10k £10.91k £13.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0