Accounts and annual returns THEO TRUST LTD

Charity Number: 1148219
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 31 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 07 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 25 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required