CORSHAM BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church preaches and teaches the gospel at four Sunday services which are open to all the community and all ages including children and youth. It holds various mid-week meetings and courses, supports overseas missions and serves the local community via a Toddler Group, Debt Advice Centre, as well as a biweekly midweek service and by going into local schools and prisons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £7,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
191 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 09 August 2012: Standard registration
- CBC (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GARY WOODALL | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Pillinger | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Rowe | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Jacques | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Pitman | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Street | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Philip Prior | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Windridge Perks | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Holmes | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Gareth Pillinger | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CHRISTIE | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.58k | £296.23k | £256.86k | £259.47k | £283.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £263.19k | £250.74k | £220.65k | £215.93k | £221.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £152 | £126 | £1.00k | £5.00k | £7.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JAN 2009
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Corsham Baptist Church
Priory Street
CORSHAM
SN13 0AS
- Phone:
- 01249701078
- Email:
- office@corshambaptists.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window