Financial history RUFFORTH PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 503002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £9.88k £24.46k £31.17k £29.18k £42.21k
Total expenditure £14.35k £10.26k £20.97k £20.83k £39.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.34k £10.10k N/A N/A