SELBY ABBEY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply income received to the restoration, repair and upkeep of the fabric of Selby Abbey or to the restoration, modification and maintenance of the organ of Selby Abbey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 February 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ENGELHART | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fraser Stewart | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Simpson | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Martin Clarke | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Pullan | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Crossland | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Caulfield | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
TOM PILCHER | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Thomson | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Charles Weetman | Trustee | 04 September 2011 |
|
|||||
JENNIFER COOKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.94k | £279.73k | £355.97k | £30.56k | £39.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.44k | £84.35k | £87.34k | £329.67k | £169.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 02 October 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 05 October 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 05 October 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 DECEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS DATED 30 MAY 1974 AND 20 JUNE 1994.
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ABBEY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF TRUST)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SELBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
EQUINOX HOUSE
CLIFTON PARK
SHIPTON ROAD
YORK
YO30 5PA
- Phone:
- 01757703731
- Email:
- selbyabbeytrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window