Accounts and annual returns MERCEDES CURNOW FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1149218
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2015 08 May 2016 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2014 01 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2014 Not Required