Financial history ZAD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1150211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £3.58k £7.97k £26.59k £561 £7.58k
Total expenditure £3.06k £7.21k £19.59k £13.43k £12.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £3.50k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.09k N/A N/A