SOUTH NORTHANTS COMMUNITY RESPONDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
South Northants Community Responders is made up of a group of volunteers who have been trained by East Midlands Ambulance Service to provide emergency medical aid to people living and working in the local community. The purpose of a Community First Responder Group is to provide emergency medical care until the professional service arrives on scene.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 01 October 2012: Standard registration
- SOUTH NORTHANTS RESPONDERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Keith Perryman | Chair | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Joy Flanagan | Trustee | 15 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Mark Crossley | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Bartlett | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephenie Carpenter | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.46k | £46.50k | £25.69k | £47.62k | £74.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.66k | £9.62k | £12.55k | £35.53k | £44.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £2.00k | £1.87k | £6.65k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 17 September 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 17 September 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 05 August 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | 05 August 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDING IN SOUTH NORTHAMPTIONSHIRE, HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY RESPONDING TO LIFE THREATING EMERGENCIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HADDONS
WEST HADDON ROAD
RAVENSTHORPE
NORTHAMPTON
NN6 8ET
- Phone:
- 01327 828733
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window