AALE MUHAMMAD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide water pumps, wells to those who don't have access to clean water. We build houses for the homeless. We provide funding to help start small businesses. We help with medicine care, hospital, surgery fees. We help the disabled, widowed and orphans - providing food, shelter, shoes, clothes, educational fees and any other resources required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Pakistan
Governance
- 19 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAFIZ MOHAMMAD FAROOQ SHAH | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|||||
MRS ZURWATUN NISA | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ZUBDAH-TUN NISA | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.21k | £1.89k | £8.43k | £26.78k | £15.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.95k | £1.78k | £34.06k | £39.45k | £4.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 September 2024 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 16 June 2023 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 16 June 2023 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 20 July 2022 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04 JUN 2012
Charitable objects
A)THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR AMONGST THOSE AFFECTED BY NATURAL DISASTERS, WARS, CONFLICTS, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND OTHER HUMANITARIAN EMERGENCIES, BY THE PROVISION OF MONETARY OR OTHER ASSISTANCE,INCLUDING MEDICINES, HOSPITALS, SHELTER AND FOOD.B)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT TO ORGANISE MAINSTREAM AND SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION AND FACILITATING BASIC LITERACY AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT, WITH THE OVERALL AIM TO IMPROVE QUALITY OF LIFE, ENHANCE LIFE SKILLS, IMPROVE LIVELIHOOD OPPORTUNITIES AND ENGAGE THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND OTHER COMMUNITIES THROUGH LEARNING AND SKILLS DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO ORPHANS, REFUGEES, DISABLED AND DISPLACED PEOPLE;C)TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
168 Fosbrooke Road
Birmingham
B10 9JP
- Phone:
- 07957195722
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window