BEXLEYHEATH COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Kent
Governance
- 02 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Garth Russel Vincer | Chair | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Blanchard | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David James Scutt | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Anne Martin | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.66k | £72.72k | £77.22k | £107.56k | £95.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.84k | £87.24k | £96.32k | £109.18k | £103.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY BY ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. THE OBJECTS TO BE CARRIED OUT AS A PROCLAMATION OF THE BELIEFS SET OUT IN CLAUSE 8 OF THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lyndhurst Chapel
Lyndhurst Road
Barnehurst
Kent
DA7 6DL
- Phone:
- 07462877202
- Email:
- info@newhopechurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window