HERTFORDSHIRE EQUALITY COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HEC is an organisation committed to promoting equality and diversity and any issue arising from the provisions of relevant legislation principally in the local government area of Hertfordshire for the benefit of the residents, workers, students or visitors. HEC also organises and facilitates cooperation and partnership working between third sector, statutory and other bodies within Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 04 April 2013: Standard registration
- HEC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Belinis DL | Chair | 25 February 2014 |
|
|||||||
Andy Gregg | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
Josephine O'Driscoll | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Dellow | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ERROL JOHN MBA,CQSW | Trustee | 31 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||
TERRY SILKE | Trustee | 31 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.10k | £33.89k | £7.93k | £13.83k | £29 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.64k | £24.63k | £17.25k | £17.71k | £5.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF HERTFORDSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDINGS BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, AGE, SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND RELIGION OR BELIE; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
World Forum. Sherma Baston Centre
10-12 Exchange Road
STEVENAGE
Hertfordshire
SG1 1PZ
- Phone:
- 07465818277
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window