REACHOUT COMMUNITY CHURCH IRCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FAMILY SERVICES / COMMUNION CHILDRENS BIBLE CLASS / ADULT BIBLE STUDY YOUTH CAFE COFFEE MORNINGS & SOCIAL GATHERINGS GIFTS TO THE NEEDY, LOCAL CAUSES & CHARITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 19 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Ian Amadeus Hodgson | Chair | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Terence Barley | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gihan Ajith Goonesekera | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Douglas Hodgson | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Angela Moses | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.02k | £54.68k | £50.95k | £54.86k | £51.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.43k | £31.16k | £51.90k | £50.21k | £40.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAY 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FORM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Reachout Community Church
2-4 High Street
Irchester
Wellingborough
NN29 7AB
- Phone:
- 07821272355
- Website:
-
rcci.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window