CFL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We will bring together experts from business, education, learning & development and psychology to create and deliver new approaches to and a curriculum model for youth leadership development in schools, colleges and universities to inspire young people with the awareness, skills, attitudes and behaviours to lead themselves and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Austria
- Bahrain
- France
- Hungary
- India
- Malaysia
- Mexico
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Portugal
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Thailand
- Ukraine
- United States
Governance
- 08 August 2012: Standard registration
- THE YOUTH LEADERSHIP TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARIO MICHAEL PETERS | Chair | 02 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Raven Biason Frias | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
CLAUDIA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.11k | £14.74k | £70.04k | £116.48k | £166.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132 | £3.28k | £58.28k | £122.69k | £151.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 June 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 June 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 08 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 July 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 July 2022 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 June 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 20 June 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 JUL 2012 as amended on 08 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE THE ACQUISITION AND DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE?S (UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS) AWARENESS, BEHAVIOURS, SKILLS AND ATTITUDES FOR PERSONAL LEADERSHIP WITHIN EDUCATIONAL SETTINGS, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT INCLUDING BY: - DEVELOPING NEW YOUTH LEADERSHIP DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES AND CURRICULA; - SUPPORTING EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO DELIVER YOUTH LEADERSHIP DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES AND CURRICULA FOR THE YOUNG PEOPLE THEY WORK WITH; - DELIVERING YOUTH LEADERSHIP DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES TO YOUNG PEOPLE DIRECTLY. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH AND PROMOTION OF YOUNG PEOPLE?S (UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS) PERSONAL LEADERSHIP DEVELOPMENT WITHIN EDUCATIONAL SETTINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cleeves
The Fooks
Horsley
Stroud
GL6 0PA
- Phone:
- 01453 833752
- Email:
- info@curriculumforlife.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window