SOUTH WORKINGTON YOUTH PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance in life and relieve the needs of young people in South Workington through (a)The provision of recreational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve conditions of life (b)Providing support and activities which will develop skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature & responsible individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £11,326 from 2 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 29 November 2012: Standard registration
- SWYP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARETH DOUGLAS-BROWN | Trustee | 29 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM BAKER | Trustee | 29 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.82k | £76.04k | £68.30k | £71.16k | £88.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.87k | £71.43k | £72.14k | £71.30k | £88.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | £11.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN SOUTH WORKINGTON THROUGH:(A)THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE,DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE;(B)PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS,CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55A Moorlands Drive
Stainburn
Workington
CA14 4UJ
- Phone:
- 07713864850
- Email:
- swyp@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window