DONCASTER P2 LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to recreate the Sir Nigel Gresley designed 'Cock O' The North' Locomotive via covenants, donations and the sale of merchandise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Doncaster
Governance
- 20 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR DAVE COURT | Chair | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Ian Rolls | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Isaac | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Byrne | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.13k | £4.59k | £3.95k | £3.25k | £4.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165 | £8.47k | £1.56k | £4.97k | £3.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 SEP 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC DEDICATED TO THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF LOCOMOTIVE BUILDING IN DONCASTER TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ACQUISITION, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, EXHIBITION OR OPERATION OF THE 1938 STREAMLINED VERSION OF SIR NIGEL GRESLEY DESIGNED STEAM LOCOMOTIVE COCK O’ THE NORTH AND OTHER STEAM LOCOMOTIVES, ROLLING STOCK, EQUIPMENT AND ARTEFACTS, RELICS, DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS OF HISTORIC INTEREST AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Town Moor Avenue
Doncaster
DN2 6BL
- Phone:
- 01302323964
- Email:
- info@cockothenorth.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window