Financial history CORNERSTONE COLLECTIVE OF CHURCHES

Charity number: 1152099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £289.35k £605.02k £568.81k £639.78k £706.75k
Total expenditure £271.07k £347.97k £491.97k £624.64k £698.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.09k N/A £14.99k £21.81k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £597.47k £552.51k £580.66k £648.18k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £7.56k £12.40k £21.56k £18.86k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £3.15k £35.91k £39.70k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £750 £1.64k £5
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £347.97k £491.97k £624.64k £698.75k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.64k £3.60k £21.80k £30.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £6.69k £12.87k £21.88k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0