KENNETH J HARRISON EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Award of bursaries to 9 students to study at UK universities commencing September 2018.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 06 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KENNETH JOHN HARRISON | Chair | 27 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MONICA DENHAM | Trustee | 27 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN JOYCE LEWIS | Trustee | 27 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BRUCE | Trustee | 27 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.48k | £9.25k | £13.50k | £13.13k | £14.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.20k | £10.80k | £12.45k | £12.91k | £14.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 APR 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO APPLY THE NET INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND ANY PART OF THE CAPITAL TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR IN FURTHERANCE OF THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF BURSARIES TO BE FROM TIME TO TIME AWARDED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER:- - THE BURSARIES ARE TO BE AWARDED TO PERSONS READING FOR FULL-TIME FIRST DEGREES AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR UNIVERSITY LEVEL INSTITUTION WHEREVER SITUATE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. - THE BURSARIES ARE TO BE AWARDED TO PERSONS WHO COMPLETED THEIR SCHOOLING AT A SCHOOL OR COLLEGE SITUATE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE WITHIN 15 MILES OF THE STONEBOW, LINCOLN, AT WHICH NO CHARGE IS MADE FOR ADMISSION TO OR ATTENDANCE AT THE RELEVANT SCHOOL OR COLLEGE - THE BURSARIES ARE TO BE AWARDED IN AN ANNUAL SUM BUT MAY BE PAID IN INSTALMENTS AND MAY BE MADE SUBJECT TO CONTINUED ENROLMENT ON THE COURSE FOR WHICH THEY WERE RESPECTIVELY AWARDED, SATISFACTORY ACADEMIC PROFRESS AND SATISFACTORY ATTENDANCE. - THE BURSARIES WILL, SUBJECT TO CONTINUED ENROLMENT, SATISFACTORY ACADEMIC PROGRESS AND SATISFACTORY ATTENDANCE NORMALLY BE TENABLE FOR THE NORMAL DURATION OF THE COURSE FOR WHICH THEY WERE RESPECTIVELY AWARDED BUT MAY BE BUT NOT NEED BE SUSPENDED DURING THE PERIOD OF ANY PLACEMENT IN INDUSTRY, PERIOD OF STUDY ABROAD OR OTHER EVENTS. - THE BURSARIES MAY BE MEANS TESTED - THE BURSARIES MAY BE AWARDED ON ACADEMIC MERIT OR AWARDED SUBJECT TO ANY OTHER REASONABLE CRITERIA - THE BURSARIES SHALL BE AWARDED TO PERSONS READING FOR DEGREES IN WHICH AT LEAST 60% OF THE CREDITS AWARDED SHALL BE AWARDED IN ONE OR MORE SCIENTIFIC SUBJECTS (INCLUDING MATHEMATICS AND ANY BRANCH OF ENGINEERING BUT NOT INCLUDING SOCIAL SCIENCES PSYCHOLOGY OR ANY COURSE LEADING TO A PRIMARY QUALIFICATION IN MEDICINE) WITH A REASONABLE PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS READING CHEMISTRY OR CHEMICAL ENGINEERING - ONE OR MORE BURSARIES MAY BE, BUT NEED NOT BE, AWARDED EACH YEAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
KJH Education Trust
PO Box 334
Malvern
WR14 9GJ
- Phone:
- 01684540347
- Email:
- mjledtrust@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window