THE FABRETTO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FABRETTO'S MISSION IS TO EMPOWER CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES IN NICARAGUA TO REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AND IMPROVE THEIR LIVELIHOODS THROUGH EDUCATION AND NUTRITION. THIS MISSION IS ACHIEVED THROUGH FIVE PROGRAM AREAS: EARLY AND PRIMARY EDUCATION ENRICHMENT, RURAL SECONDARY EDUCATION, VOCATIONAL AND LIFE SKILLS EDUCATION, FOOD SECURITY AND NUTRITION & COMMUNITY WELL-BEING AND DEVELOPMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nicaragua
Governance
- 19 December 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Esteve | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Raquel Gallardo | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Knox | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 28 October 2022 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 22 December 2020 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/12/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF LATIN AMERICA AND, IN PARTICULAR, NICARAGUA; THE WORK OF THE LATE FR. RAFAEL MARIA FABRETTO WHO DEDICATED HIS LIFE TO SERVING CHILDREN IN IMPOVERISHED COMMUNITIES IN NICARAGUA UNTIL HIS DEATH IN 1990; AND, THE ASOCIACION FAMILIA PADRE FABRETTO AND OTHER ENTITIES WORKING TOGETHER TO CONTINUE THIS LEGACY OF SERVICE. 2) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND EDUCATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN NICARAGUA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO NOT-FOR-PROFIT ENTITIES, PRIMARILY THE ASOCIACIÓN FAMILIA PADRE FABRETTO, RUNNING OR SUPPORTING PROGRAMS AIMED TO EMPOWER CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THOSE COMMUNITIES TO REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL, IMPROVE THEIR LIVELIHOODS, AND TAKE ADVANTAGE OF ECONOMIC OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF NICARAGUA.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O CGS&H (D. Gottlieb / J. Turner)
City Place House
55 Basinghall Street
London
EC2V 5EH
- Phone:
- +34 619735586
- Email:
- info@fabretto.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window