STEP AND LEARN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer free Conductive Education for children with Cerebral Palsy and associated motor disorders. We take children from birth up to the age of five from Tuesdays to Fridays, and from five to sixteen on Saturdays. A summer and winter club is also provided out of term time. We operate throughout Kent. Currently we have 53 children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 23 August 2012: Standard registration
- 23 March 2016: Funds received from 1094298 FAMILY OF NURSERY DEVELOPMENT ( F O N D )
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lianne Bealey | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Parsler | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Streatfield | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Lenard Barden | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.97k | £79.77k | £58.59k | £60.58k | £45.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.49k | £75.53k | £72.60k | £46.06k | £55.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE, WELFARE, INTEREST, TREATMENT, EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN THE MEDWAY TOWN AND DISTRICT OF CEREBRAL PALSIED PERSONS (WHICH EXPRESSION IN THESE PRESENTS SHALL MEAN AND INCLUDE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF CERBRAL PALSY AND OTHER DISABLED PERSONS, AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT: (A) TO PROVIDE, MAINTAIN AND CONDUCT CLINICS, TREATMENT AND TRAINING CENTRES, NURSERIES, DAY AND RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, EMPLOYMENT CENTRES, HOLIDAY CAMPS AND HOMES, CLUBS, HOSTELS AND OTHER FOUNDATIONS. (B) TO PROVIDE AND ENCOURAGE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR DIAGNOSIS, MEDICAL PHYSICAL AND SURGICAL TREATMENT WITH ALL NECESSARY APPLIANCES, THERAPIES AND EDUCATION. (C) TO TAKE ALL MEASURES TO ASSIST CEREBRAL PALSIED PERSONS AND OTHER DISABLED PERSONS, SO FAR AS IT IS POSSIBLE, TO ACHIEVE SELF DETERMINATION. (D) TO PROMOTE, CONDUCT, ENGAGE IN RESEARCH AND EXPERIMENTAL WORK CALCULATED TO BE OF BENEFIT TO CEREBRAL PALSIED PERSONS AND INTO THE PREVENTION OF CEREBRAL PALSY. (E) TO COLLECT AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION RELATING TO THE FORE-GOING OBJECTS AND EXCHANGE SUCH INFORMATION WITH OTHER BODIES HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS AND SPECIFICALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY; (1) TO CAUSE TO BE WRITTEN AND PRINTED OR OTHERWISE ORIGINATED OR REPRODUCED, AND TO BE PUBLISHED OR CIRCULATED WHETHER GRATUITOUSLY OR NOT ANY NEWSPAPERS, PERIODICALS, MAGAZINES, BOOKS, PAMPHLETS, LEAFLETS, OR OTHER DOCUMENTS OR FILMS OR RECORDED TAPES; (2) TO ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR OR JOIN IN ARRANGING AND PROVIDING FOR THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS, MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES, SEMINARS AND TRAINING COURSES. (F) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TO MAKE GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO PROVIDE, EQUIPMENT AND APPARATUS FOR CEREBRAL PALSIED PERSONS OR OTHER DISABLED PERSONS AND GENERALLY TO PROVIDE ANY SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE TO LOCAL OR CENTRAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF PERSONS CALCULATED TO BE OF BENEFIT TO CEREBRAL PALSIED PERSONS COLLECTIVELY OR INDIVIDUALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shimran
Pear Tree Lane
Shorne
GRAVESEND
Kent
DA12 3JX
- Phone:
- 07446975693
- Email:
- info@stepandlearn.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window