ST WOOLOS SINFONIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Orchestral musicians
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2012: Standard registration
- ST. WOOLOS PLAYERS (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR CHRISTOPH MADLER MD.FRCP | Chair | 19 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jane Leney | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Cox | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glynis MacDonald | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Maureen Mahoney | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bishop Richard Fenwick | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Huw Griffiths | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Masters | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES LENEY MB.MRCGP | Trustee | 19 August 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.82k | £2.80k | £10.63k | £11.84k | £12.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.56k | £1.30k | £8.94k | £13.02k | £11.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 APR 2012 AS AMENDED ON 20 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED ON 21 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Ynys-Y-Coed
Oakdale
BLACKWOOD
Gwent
NP12 0EG
- Phone:
- 01495229025
- Email:
- stwoolos.sinfonia@gmail.com
- Website:
-
stwoolossinfonia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window