WESTFERRY COMMUNITY ORGANISATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Projects Cultural Projects Youth Engagement Women Activities Elderly Activities Luncheon Club Advice Surgery Supplementary Classes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 16 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AHMODUR RAHMAN KHAN | Chair | 24 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Ahmed Ali | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mahmod Islam Hannan | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Atiqur Rahman | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ranu Miah | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ishaque Ali | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAUDDIN AHMED | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMOD MORTUZA MIAH | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.01k | £15.18k | £58.95k | £86.31k | £108.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.44k | £65.76k | £59.18k | £51.76k | £79.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 DEC 2011
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION ON QUR'AN AND ISLAMIC STUDIES FOR THE PUBLIC IN WEST FERRY AND SURROUNDING AREA PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE ISLAMIC FAITH. 2. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER ROOMS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT ISLAM. 3. TO PROVIDE ADVICE ON HEALTH AND SOCIAL ISSUES IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF COMMUNITY IN WEST FERRY, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA,
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 THE QUARTERDECK
LONDON
E14 8SJ
- Phone:
- 02073750598
- Email:
- westferryco@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window