ROCKETS SPORT AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACTIVITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT HEALTH AND WELL-BEING VOLUNTEERING SOCIAL INCLUSION SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 August 2012: Standard registration
- RSEF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Heidi Johnson | Trustee | 07 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Fisher | Trustee | 07 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Turner | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.92k | £91.54k | £118.16k | £139.04k | £163.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.58k | £70.08k | £140.84k | £152.99k | £159.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING (A) ADVANCING THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT AND PHYSICAL ACTIVITY, RECREATION, ART AND CULTURE OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION (INCLUDING EDUCATION, TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF LEADERSHIP), (C) PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING (WHERE TO DO SO FURTHERS A CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES), (D) PROMOTING THE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF THOSE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY WHO ARE IN NEED AND (E) PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY OR OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS (E) THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW)
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Finch Road
Earley
Reading
RG6 7JX
- Phone:
- 01189263040
- Email:
- matt@rocketsfoundation.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window