JAZZY KIDZ
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides nursery care and early years education for babies and young children, as well as holiday play schemes and after school care. Caters for children with special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 14 August 2012: Standard registration
- 28 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.54k | £145.41k | £202.89k | £228.44k | £228.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.00k | £109.67k | £199.41k | £226.52k | £247.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £202.81k | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 01 February 2017 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
01 February 2017 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 10 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 10 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 08/08/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EARLY YEARS EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN AGED UP TO 4 YEARS OLD THROUGH THE SETTING UP AND RUNNING OF A NURSERY AND CHILD CENTRE IN THE AREAS OF EDGBASTON, HOCKLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHIN BIRMINGHAM. 2. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF 11 YEARS (OF SCHOOL AGE) LIVING IN THE AREAS OF EDGBASTON, HOCKLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF BIRMINGHAM BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE THROUGH ORGANISED OUT OF SCHOOL PROGRAMMES INCORPORATING EDUCATIONAL, PHYSICAL AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING CHILDREN BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window