Financial history HVH ARTS LTD

Charity number: 1149607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £203.23k £116.34k £146.20k £213.96k £263.69k
Total expenditure £140.79k £121.06k £164.92k £172.38k £195.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.00k £40.17k