BURNESIDE BRASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objects are to advance the education and appreciation of the public in the art and science of brass band music by the presentation of concerts and similar activities and also, to provide facilities and equipment for the teaching and playing of brass band music for the general public, but particularly the young.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 10 September 2012: Standard registration
- BURNESIDE BRASS BAND (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVER MICHAEL BATEMAN | Chair | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Martyn John Bostock | Trustee | 10 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WILLIAM HARTLEY | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HIGSON | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ERIC ALAN JONES | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
STUART BELL MIDGTE | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
NERINA DIAZ | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CAINE | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.86k | £29 | £1.47k | £6.30k | £7.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.11k | £2.03k | £2.73k | £4.42k | £7.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 06/09/2012
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF BRASS BAND MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES.2.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PLAYING OF BRASS INSTRUMENTS BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND PUBLIC PERFORMANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Springfield
Preston Patrick
Milnthorpe
LA7 7PB
- Phone:
- 01539766249
- Email:
- stuart.bell@cropper.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window