Financial history THE REDBRIDGE MUSIC LOUNGE

Charity number: 1151132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.41k £34.08k £14.03k £18.86k £24.02k
Total expenditure £12.78k £10.57k £13.06k £27.53k £21.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.90k £1.00k £1.50k £4.65k £6.00k