COMMUNITY FOOTBALL ACADEMY (CFA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Football Coaching & Fitness Football Tournaments for children & Adults to promote community cohesion & intergration Life skill workshops TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUISVELY THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL,PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
- Lancashire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Albania
Governance
- 26 October 2012: Standard registration
- CFA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Maravia | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irfan Adam | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Basid Ali Gulammustafa | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sazid Seedat | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
AHMED MARAVIA | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
FAIZAL PATEL | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED HAFEJEE | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.95k | £24.12k | £69.52k | £109.69k | £57.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.21k | £23.94k | £54.83k | £125.20k | £56.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 30 March 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 30 March 2024 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 01 May 2023 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2012
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUISVELY THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL,PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.2.TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE,INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERSETS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sports Lounge
UNIT 5
195 Gwendolen Road
Leicester
LE5 5FN
- Phone:
- 07473200404
- Email:
- cfa-4@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window