MAY & BAKER EASTBROOK COMMUNITY CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities are primarily sports based for the local community and local sports organisations but there are a number of other community programmes based at the club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Newham
- Redbridge
Governance
- 28 September 2012: Standard registration
- MAY & BAKER EASTBROOK COMMUNITY CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN THOMPSON | Chair | 29 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Princess Opeyemi Ayomikun Bright | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Maria Wright | Trustee | 02 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Whisker | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DARREN JOHN GROOM | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WILLIAMS | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER NORRIS DYER | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY WEST | Trustee | 29 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PARNELL | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tony Ramsay | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
COLIN WINGROVE | Trustee | 23 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.90k | £11.75k | £0 | £25.10k | £14.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.79k | £14.00k | £1.50k | £9.75k | £27.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 March 2025 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2025 | 407 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 March 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 April 2022 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2021 | 310 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/2014
Charitable objects
A. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING A VARIETY OF SPORTS, INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOOTBALL, RUGBY AND CRICKET. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE AND YOUNG ADULTS, IN THE PROVISION OF SPORTING FACILITIES, PHYSICAL ACTIVITY AND YOUTH WORK PROGRAMMES IN ORDER TO ENCOURAGE THEIR INDEPENDENCE AND INTEGRATION INTO THE COMMUNITY. C. PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
May & Baker Sports & Social Club
Dagenham Road
Romford
RM7 0QX
- Phone:
- 020 8984 5251
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window