WETHERBY RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Wetherby and surrounding areas by the provision of facilities for playing rugby union.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 06 September 2012: Standard registration
- WETHERBY RUFC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Watts | Chair | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Clutterbuck | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cedric Duval | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Robert Marr | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Hewitt | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Hoather | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myles Austen Oates | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.93k | £54.51k | £97.14k | £94.08k | £71.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.36k | £54.80k | £74.53k | £116.20k | £65.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 12 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JUN 2012 as amended on 17 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WETHERBY AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING RUGBY UNION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wetherby RUFC
C/- Grange Park Sports Club
Old Boston Road
Wetherby
West Yorkshire
LS22 5NB
- Phone:
- 07557077245
- Email:
- james.marr@wetherbyrufc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window