MESSIANIC TESTIMONY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a ministry, our passion to reach Jewish people takes those who share our vision into the heart of Europe, throughout the UK, down to Cape Town in South Africa, and over into Israel. All in all, these are exciting days to be involved in taking the transforming message of God's love to the Jew first.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Israel
- Scotland
- South Africa
Governance
- 17 September 2012: Standard registration
- 23 July 2014: Funds received from 274750 THE MESSIANIC TESTIMONY
- MESSIANIC TESTIMONY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Colin Leyshon | Chair | 06 August 2012 |
|
|||||
Philip Eric Toms | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christina Louise Rodgers | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Matthew Williams | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Helen Kate Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JONATHAN ROBERTS | Trustee | 06 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.36k | £316.93k | £172.35k | £307.05k | £187.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £360.85k | £330.38k | £318.10k | £315.64k | £323.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/07/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/09/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THROUGH THE EVANGELISATION AND DISCIPLESHIP OF JEWISH PEOPLE IN THE UK AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD; AND (B) BY THE TEACHING OF BIBLICAL TRUTH WITH SPECIFIC REGARD TO THE PURPOSES OF GOD FOR ISRAEL AND THE JEWISH PEOPLE. 2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS THROUGH ACTS OF COMPASSION AND CARE IN THE UK AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Sheffield Park Way
EASTBOURNE
BN23 8LA
- Phone:
- 07847337641
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window