Trustees DAVID OLUWALE MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1151426

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Meleri Roberts | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Asher Gammon | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Hudson | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abdullah Adekola | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mariam Sadikot | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Ajayi | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Marshall Katung | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Montgomery | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emily Zobel Marshall | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hindle-Marsh | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAX FARRAR PHD | Trustee | 01 August 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.