RSA ACADEMIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity are to advance the education of the public including but without limitation through assistance in the establishment and operation of academy schools or any other schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 September 2012: Standard registration
- 07 March 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.61k | £270.73k | £275.70k | £236.51k | £60.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.36k | £249.00k | £292.59k | £225.00k | £175.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 28 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH ASSISTANCE TO THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF ACADEMY SCHOOLS (THE "OBJECTS").
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window