UAMUZI BORA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UAMUZI BORA SUPPORTS THE MINISTRY OF HEALTH IN KENYA TO DELIVER CARE AND SUPPORT TO PEOPLE LIVING WITH HIV. WE WORK TO STRENGTHEN PATHWAYS OF HIV CARE AND SUPPORT IN KENYA AND PROVIDE TRAINING AND SUPERVISION TO HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS AND PEOPLE LIVING WITH HIV.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kenya
Governance
- 19 October 2012: Standard registration
- 26 August 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- UB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2017 | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 354 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | 21 January 2022 | 720 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS. (1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN KENYA BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CARE AND SUPPORT SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. (2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO HEALTH PROMOTION AND PREVENTION;
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window